SC H3775 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-7)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Act No. 241
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-7)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Act No. 241
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allow An Adult Adoptee Eighteen Years Of Age Or Older To Obtain A Copy Of The Adoptee's Own Original Birth Certificate In Certain Circumstances, To Allow A Biological Parent To Execute A Contact Preference Form And A Medical History Form To Be Provided To The Adult Adoptee Upon Request, And For Other Purposes
Title
Birth certificates of adopted children
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-10 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Act No. 241 | |
2018-05-30 | Effective date 07/01/19 | |
2018-05-17 | Signed By Governor | |
2018-05-14 | Ratified R 241 | |
2018-05-10 | House | Roll call Yeas-88 Nays-0 |
2018-05-10 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Amended |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Medical Affairs |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2018-04-06 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2018-04-06 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2018-04-05 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2018-04-05 | House | Roll call Yeas-102 Nays-0 |
2018-04-05 | House | Read second time |
2018-04-05 | House | Amended |
2018-04-05 | House | Debate interrupted |
2018-04-03 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2018-04-03 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Brawley, King |
2017-03-02 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Collins |
2017-02-22 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Henegan |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2017-02-16 | House | Introduced and read first time |