SC H3772 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-8)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-05 - Scrivener's error corrected
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 61-4-280 So As To Allow A Retail Dealer Licensed To Sell Beer And Wine In This State To Use A Delivery Service, Or Its Own Employees Or Independent Contractors To Facilitate The Delivery Of Certain Beer And Wine, To Provide For A Delivery License, To Specify Certain Delivery Prohibitions And Other Requirements For The Delivery Of Such Beer And Wine.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcohol

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-11 - House - House: Table Amendment 4 Amendment Number 4 (Y: 82 N: 27 NV: 6 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 84 N: 27 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-05 Scrivener's error corrected
2022-05-04SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
2022-04-22SenateReferred to Subcommittee: Talley (ch), Hutto, Matthews, Climer, Senn, Cash, Harpootlian
2021-04-30SenateReferred to Subcommittee: Talley (ch), Hutto, Matthews, Climer, Senn
2021-03-16SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-03-16SenateIntroduced and read first time
2021-03-12HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2021-03-11HouseUnanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
2021-03-11HouseRoll call Yeas-84 Nays-27
2021-03-11HouseRead second time
2021-03-11HouseAmended
2021-03-11HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Garvin, Alexander
2021-03-10HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Davis, Kimmons
2021-03-04HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Martin, Kirby
2021-02-25HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Erickson, Bradley
2021-02-24HouseRequests for debate-Rep
2021-02-24HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Murray, Gilliard, Hewitt, Fry
2021-02-23HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: M.M.Smith, Brittain
2021-02-22 Scrivener's error corrected
2021-02-18HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Bannister
2021-02-18HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
2021-02-17HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: W.Newton
2021-01-28HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-01-28HouseIntroduced and read first time

Same As/Similar To

S0524 (Similar To) 2021-02-04 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
614280(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback