SC H3771 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 21-2)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-25 - Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works HJ-56
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Status: Introduced on March 25 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-25 - Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works HJ-56
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Summary
A BILL TO AMEND SECTION 1-1-696, CODE OF LAWS OF SOUTH CAROLINA, 1976, RELATING TO THE STATE'S OFFICIAL LANGUAGE, SO AS TO PROVIDE THAT AFTER JULY 1, 2009, ALL STATE AGENCIES AND POLITICAL SUBDIVISIONS OF THE STATE SHALL OFFER ALL SERVICES, PUBLICATIONS, PRINTED, AUDIO AND VIDEO MATERIALS, AND TEST IN AN ENGLISH-ONLY FORMAT, UNLESS OTHERWISE REQUIRED BY FEDERAL LAW OR REGULATION, AND TO PROVIDE EXCEPTIONS.
Title
Provide That After July 1, 2009, All State Agencies And Political Subdivisions Of The State Shall Offer All Services, Publications, Printed, Audio And Video Materials, And Test In An English-only Format, Unless Otherwise Required By Federal Law Or Regulation, And To Provide Exceptions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-25 | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works HJ-56 | |
2009-03-25 | Introduced and read first time HJ-56 |
Same As/Similar To
S0003 (Similar To) 2009-01-13 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary SJ-73
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=3771&session=118 |