SC H3765 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-20 - Referred to Subcommittee: Talley (ch), Hutto, Matthews, Climer, Senn, Cash, Harpootlian
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-20 - Referred to Subcommittee: Talley (ch), Hutto, Matthews, Climer, Senn, Cash, Harpootlian
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 27-40-20, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Purposes And Rules Of Construction For The Residential Landlord And Tenant Act, So As To Exempt Certain Tenancies From The Act; And To Amend Section 45-2-60, Relating To The Ejectment Of A Person From A Lodging Establishment, So As To Authorize An Innkeeper To Request Assistance From Law Enforcement To Eject A Person And To Provide That A Person Ejected From A Campground Has Ten Days To Make A Claim For Property Left At The Time Of Ejectment.
Title
Landlord Tenant Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-03 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Talley (ch), Hutto, Matthews, Climer, Senn, Cash, Harpootlian |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Senn (ch), Matthews, Garrett, M.Johnson, Stephens |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2021-03-04 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2021-03-03 | House | Roll call Yeas-111 Nays-0 |
2021-03-03 | House | Read second time |
2021-03-03 | House | Amended |
2021-03-02 | House | Requests for debate removed-Rep |
2021-02-25 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 3-2-21 |
2021-02-23 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2021-02-17 | House | Committee report: Favorable Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2021-01-28 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2021-01-28 | House | Introduced and read first time |