SC H3760 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Act No. 67
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Act No. 67
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Article 3, Chapter 79, Title 38, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The South Carolina Medical Malpractice Liability Joint Underwriting Association, So As To Merge The Joint Underwriting Association With The Patients' Compensation Fund And To Rename The Surviving Entity The South Carolina Medical Malpractice Association, To Define Necessary Terms, To Alter The Membership Of The Association, To Establish Certain Requirements For The Initial Filing Of Policy Forms, To Require The Members Of The Association To Pay An Assessment Equal To The Member's Proportional Share Of The Accumulated Deficit Of The Association, To Increase Policy Limits For Policies Issued By The Association On Behalf Of Its Members, To Require The Association To Submit All Policy Forms, Classifications, Rates, Rating Plans, Or Rules To The Director Of The Department Of Insurance, To Establish A Uniform Assessment On The Membership Of The Association And Provide For An Additional Surcharge On Premiums That Must Be Assessed On Association Policyholders, To Establish Certain Obligations For Terminated Members Of The Association, To Establish Certain Conditions Regarding The Association's Annual Financial Statement And The Examination Of The Association By The Director Of The Department Of Insurance, To Provide The Effective Date Of The Merger Of The Patients' Compensation Fund And The Joint Underwriting Association, To Provide For The Winding Down Of Patients' Compensation Fund, And To Provide For The Composition Of The Board And The Duties Of The Association; And By Adding Section 38-79-400 So As To Repeal The Article 5, Chapter 79, Title 38, Relating To The Patients' Compensation Fund, Upon The Merger Of The Patients' Compensation Fund Into The Joint Underwriting Association. - Ratified Title
Title
Medical Malpractice Liability Joint Underwriting Association
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-09 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 99 N: 3 NV: 18 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 82 N: 19 NV: 17 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 82 N: 19 NV: 17 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-05 | Act No. 67 | |
2019-05-31 | Effective date 05/16/19 | |
2019-05-16 | Signed By Governor | |
2019-05-13 | Ratified R 87 | |
2019-05-09 | House | Roll call Yeas-99 Nays-3 |
2019-05-09 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-37 Nays-0 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Amended |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment Tabled |
2019-05-08 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Amended |
2019-05-01 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Banking and Insurance |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Banking and Insurance |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2019-02-26 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2019-02-25 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2019-02-21 | House | Roll call Yeas-82 Nays-19 |
2019-02-21 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-21 | House | Amended |
2019-02-19 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2019-02-14 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and read first time |