SC H3755 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - Act No. 174
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - Act No. 174
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 38-77-30, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Definitions Applicable To Automobile Insurance Coverage, So As To Remove Certain Requirements For The Renewal Of An Automobile Coverage Policy And To Define The Term "reduction In Coverage"; To Amend Section 38-77-120, Relating To Notice Requirements For Cancellation Or The Refusal To Renew A Policy, So As To Allow For An Insurer To Renew A Policy With A Reduction In Coverage And To Provide Certain Requirements For The Reduction In Coverage; And To Extend The Redemption Period For Twelve Months. - Ratified Title
Title
Auto insurance coverage
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-23 - Senate - Senate: To Concur (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-09-22 - House - House: Adopt Amendment 1a Amendment Number 1a (Y: 103 N: 2 NV: 15 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 22 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 78 N: 15 NV: 27 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-09-22 - House - House: Adopt Amendment 1a Amendment Number 1a (Y: 103 N: 2 NV: 15 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 22 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 78 N: 15 NV: 27 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-07 | Act No. 174 | |
2020-10-07 | Effective date 09/30/20 | |
2020-09-30 | Signed By Governor | |
2020-09-25 | Ratified R 175 | |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-33 Nays-0 |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Concurred in House amendment and enrolled |
2020-09-23 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2020-09-22 | House | Returned to Senate with amendments |
2020-09-22 | House | Roll call Yeas-103 Nays-2 |
2020-09-22 | House | Senate amendment amended |
2020-09-15 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2020-09-15 | Senate | Amended |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Amended |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Banking and Insurance |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Banking and Insurance |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2019-03-19 | House | Roll call Yeas-92 Nays-4 |
2019-03-19 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2019-03-19 | House | Amended |
2019-03-07 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 3-19-19 |
2019-03-06 | House | Roll call Yeas-78 Nays-15 |
2019-03-06 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-28 | House | Committee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2019-02-27 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Anderson |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and read first time |