SC H3750 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Dabney
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Sections 15-38-15, 15-38-20, 15-38-40, And 15-38-50, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, All Relating To The South Carolina Contribution Among Tortfeasors Act, So As To Include Persons Or Entities For The Purposes Of Allocation Of Fault, And To Make Conforming Changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tortfeasers Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-18HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Dabney
2021-03-16HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: B.Cox
2021-03-11HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Bradley, Erickson, Herbkersman, Allison, Gagnon, Govan, Huggins, Ballentine, Wooten, D.C.Moss, Hewitt
2021-03-09HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Forrest
2021-03-04HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Burns, Haddon, Chumley, Long
2021-02-25HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Hixon, Ligon
2021-02-03HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Gilliam
2021-01-27HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-01-27HouseIntroduced and read first time

Same As/Similar To

S0145 (Similar To) 2021-01-12 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
153815(n/a)See Bill Text
153820(n/a)See Bill Text
153840(n/a)See Bill Text
153850(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback