SC H3725 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 23-2)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Act No. 37
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 23-2)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Act No. 37
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Allow School District And Private School Governing Authorities To Obtain And Store Supplies Of Epinephrine Auto-injectors For Schools To Use In Certain Circumstances; To Authorize Certain People To Prescribe And Dispense Prescriptions For Epinephrine Auto-injectors For Administration Or Self-administration By Students And Other People; To Authorize Certain School Personnel To Provide Epinephrine Auto-injectors To Students For Self-administration Of The Injector; To Authorize Certain Personnel To Administer Epinephrine Auto-injectors To Students And Other People; To Require Certain Governing Authorities Of School Districts And Private Schools, In Consultation With The Department Of Health And Environmental Control And The State Department Of Education, To Develop And Implement A Plan For Management Of Students With Life-threatening Allergies, Including For Administration And Provision Of Epinephrine Auto-injectors To Students And Other People; To Provide That Schools Are Not Subject To The South Carolina Pharmacy Act And Relevant Regulations Governing The Practice Of Pharmacy For Purposes Of Certain Actions Taken Pursuant To The Section; And To Provide For Immunity From Liability With Regard To Use Of Epinephrine Auto-injectors By Schools
Title
Safe Access to Vital Epinephrine (SAVE) Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-16 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Act No. 37 | |
2013-06-14 | Effective date 06/07/13 | |
2013-06-07 | Signed By Governor | |
2013-06-04 | Ratified R 69 | |
2013-05-16 | House | Roll call Yeas-104 Nays-0 |
2013-05-16 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-0 |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Read second time |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2013-04-25 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2013-04-24 | House | Roll call Yeas-104 Nays-0 |
2013-04-24 | House | Read second time |
2013-04-24 | House | Amended |
2013-04-18 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works |
2013-03-07 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Long, Erickson |
2013-03-06 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2013-03-05 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Sellers |
2013-02-28 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2013-02-28 | House | Introduced and read first time |