SC H3722 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-03 - Debate adjourned until Tues., 5-8-18
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-03 - Debate adjourned until Tues., 5-8-18
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Do Not Apply To The Provisions Of This Act.
Title
State Capital Improvement Bonds
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 5-8-18 |
2018-05-01 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 5-2-18 |
2018-04-17 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 4-24-18 |
2018-04-04 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 4-17-18 |
2018-04-03 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 4-4-18 |
2018-03-01 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 3-6-18 |
2018-02-28 | House | Debate adjourned until Thur., 3-1-18 |
2018-02-27 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 2-28-18 |
2018-02-15 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 2-20-18 |
2018-02-14 | House | Debate adjourned until Thur., 2-15-18 |
2018-01-25 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 1-30-18 |
2018-01-10 | House | Debate adjourned until Thur., 1-11-18 |
2017-05-10 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 1-9-18 |
2017-05-09 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 5-10-17 |
2017-05-04 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 5-9-17 |
2017-04-19 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2017-04-06 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 4-19-17 |
2017-03-30 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2017-03-29 | House | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |