SC H3710 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Pope
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Pope
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Amendment To Section 20, Article I Of The Constitution Of South Carolina, 1895, Relating To The Right To Keep And Bear Arms, So As To Provide That Every Citizen Has The Fundamental And Inalienable Right To Bear Arms In Defense Of Himself And The State, And Any Restriction On This Right Shall Be Subject To Strict Scrutiny.
Title
Right to keep and bear arms
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Pope |
2021-02-10 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hixon, Hiott, Forrest |
2021-02-09 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Huggins |
2021-02-02 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Jones |
2021-01-27 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Taylor, B.Cox, Elliott |
2021-01-26 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-01-26 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0588 (Similar To) 2021-02-23 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3710&session=124&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/3710_20210126.htm |