SC H3710 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-1)
Status: Passed on June 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-13 - Act No. 237
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-1)
Status: Passed on June 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-13 - Act No. 237
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provide An Additional Year Of Eligibility In Certain Circumstances
Title
Multiple lot discount
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-02 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 34 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 34 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-13 | Act No. 237 | |
2016-06-10 | Effective date 06/06/16 | |
2016-06-06 | Signed By Governor | |
2016-06-02 | Ratified R 254 | |
2016-06-02 | House | Roll call Yeas-104 Nays-0 |
2016-06-02 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0 |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Amended |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-34 Nays-10 |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Finance |
2015-04-29 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2015-04-29 | House | Roll call Yeas-94 Nays-0 |
2015-04-29 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2015-04-28 | House | Roll call Yeas-98 Nays-0 |
2015-04-28 | House | Read second time |
2015-04-28 | House | Amended |
2015-04-23 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2015-04-23 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Bedingfield |
2015-02-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2015-02-24 | House | Introduced and read first time |