SC H3703 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Signed By Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Increase The Maximum Number Of Times A Person May Attempt To Pass The Examination From Three To Six, To Provide A Person Who Fails The Examination A Fifth Time First Must Take Courses The Board May Require And Furnish Evidence Of Completing These Courses Before Taking The Examination A Sixth Time, And To Provide A Person Who Fails The Examination Six Or More Times May Not Be Licensed By The Board; And To Amend Section 40-45-260, Relating To The Prohibition Of The Board From Granting Licensure To Applicants Who Fail The Examination Three Or More Times, So As Increase The Number Of Allowed Attempts To Six

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Physical Therapy Examiners Board, licensure

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 34 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 17) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16 Signed By Governor
2019-05-13 Ratified R 84
2019-05-09SenateConcurred in House amendment and enrolled
2019-05-09HouseReturned to Senate with amendments
2019-05-09HouseSenate amendment amended
2019-05-08SenateRead third time and returned to House with amendments
2019-05-07SenateRoll call Ayes-34 Nays-11
2019-05-07SenateRead second time
2019-05-07SenateAmended
2019-05-07SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2019-04-18SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Medical Affairs
2019-04-10SenateReferred to Committee on Medical Affairs
2019-04-10SenateIntroduced and read first time
2019-04-10HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2019-04-09HouseRoll call Yeas-100 Nays-0
2019-04-09HouseRead second time
2019-04-09HouseAmended
2019-04-05 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-04-04HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
2019-04-02HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Hill
2019-02-19HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Sottile
2019-02-14HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Willis
2019-02-06HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Moore, Rose, Rutherford
2019-01-22HouseReferred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4045230(n/a)See Bill Text
4045260(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback