SC H3703 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 34-1)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Mace
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Mace
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminate The Department Of Transportation Commission And Its Responsibilities, To Devolve The Commission's Responsibilities Upon The Secretary Of Transportation Who Would Be Appointed By The Governor, To Provide That The Department's Annual Budget Must Be Approved By The General Assembly, To Delete The Terms "routine Operation And Maintenance" And "emergency Repairs" And Their Definitions, And The Provision That Grants The Secretary Authority To Approve Requests Regarding These Matters, To Delete The Provision That Requires The Commission To Approve Certain Highway Projects, To Provide A Process Whereby Audits Of The Department Shall Be Conducted, To Provide For The Development Of A Long-range Statewide Transportation Plan And A Statewide Transportation Improvement Program; To Repeal Article 3, Chapter 1, Title 57, Relating To The Commission Of The Department Of Transportation; And To Repeal Article 7, Chapter 1, Title 57, Relating To The Joint Transportation Review Committee.
Title
Transportation Commission
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-06 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Mace |
2017-02-21 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Allison |
2017-02-16 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Huggins |
2017-02-15 | House | Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: Willis |
2017-02-13 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Clary |
2017-02-09 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Tallon |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2017-02-08 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0301 (Similar To) 2017-01-24 - Referred to Committee on Transportation
H3784 (Similar To) 2017-02-16 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
H3784 (Similar To) 2017-02-16 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | 30 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
57 | 1 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
57 | 1 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
57 | 1 | 40 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
57 | 1 | 410 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
57 | 1 | 430 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
57 | 1 | 460 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
57 | 1 | 470 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
57 | 1 | 490 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
57 | 1 | 90 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
57 | 3 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
57 | 3 | 210 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
57 | 3 | 50 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
57 | 3 | 700 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3703&session=122&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/3703_20170208.htm |