SC H3696 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-29 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-29 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Memorialize The United States Congress To Take Certain Measures To Ensure That Science-based Data Is Used To Assess Impacts On And The Regulation Of Modern Agricultural Technologies To Include, But To Not Be Limited To, Crop Protection Chemistries, Genetically Engineered Or Enhanced Traits, And Nutrients, And Oppose Legislation Or Regulatory Action That May Result In Unnecessary Restrictions On The Use Of Certain Modern Agricultural Technologies.
Title
Congress
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | Senate | Adopted, returned to House with concurrence |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-02-22 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2017-02-22 | House | Adopted, sent to Senate |
2017-02-21 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2017-02-08 | House | Introduced |