SC H3695 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Act No. 126
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Act No. 126
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 12-37-2680, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Assessed Value Of A Vehicle, So As To Require That The Value Guides Include Adjustments For High Mileage And To Provide That If High Mileage Data Is Not Available For Motorcycles And Motorcycle Three-wheel Vehicles, The Adjustment For Such Motorcycles Shall Equal Two-thirds Of The Adjustment For Other Motor Vehicles. - Ratified Title
Title
Private passenger vehicles
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-26 | Act No. 126 | |
2020-03-26 | Effective date 03/24/20 | |
2020-03-24 | Signed By Governor | |
2020-03-19 | Ratified R 128 | |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Read third time and enrolled |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-46 Nays-0 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Transportation |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2020-01-22 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2020-01-21 | House | Roll call Yeas-117 Nays-0 |
2020-01-21 | House | Read second time |
2020-01-21 | House | Amended |
2020-01-21 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Jones |
2020-01-15 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works |
2020-01-14 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hill |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and read first time |