SC H3685 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-31 - Act No. 185
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-31 - Act No. 185
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Provide The Date When A Suspension, Cancellation, Or Revocation Of A Driver's License Commences When The Hearing Results In The Continued Suspension, Cancellation, Or Revocation Of The Driver's License; And To Repeal Section 56-3-1972 Relating To The Design Of The Uniform Parking Violation Ticket
Title
Electronic tickets and citations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-18 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 108 N: 2 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-11 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-05-11 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-31 | Act No. 185 | |
2016-05-27 | Effective date 05/25/16 | |
2016-05-25 | Signed By Governor | |
2016-05-24 | Ratified R 198 | |
2016-05-18 | House | Roll call Yeas-108 Nays-2 |
2016-05-18 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2016-05-12 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0 |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2016-03-24 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Hembree, Shealy |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2016-02-10 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2016-02-10 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2016-02-09 | House | Roll call Yeas-105 Nays-0 |
2016-02-09 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-09 | House | Amended |
2016-02-03 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2015-02-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-02-18 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
14 | 1 | 219 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 1 | 365 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 1 | 370 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 3 | 1972 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 7 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 7 | 30 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 7 | 40 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |