SC H3684 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-17 - Referred to Committee on Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-17 - Referred to Committee on Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Allow The Department Of Revenue To Implement A System Of Filing And Indexing Liens Which Is Accessible To The Public Over The Internet Or Through Other Means.
Title
Tax liens
Sponsors
Rep. Garry Smith [R] | Sen. Dwight Loftis [R] | Rep. Daniel Hamilton [R] | Rep. Jason Elliott [R] |
Rep. James Burns [R] | Rep. Eric Bedingfield [R] | Rep. Samuel Rivers [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-11 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 26 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2018-04-12 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2018-04-11 | House | Roll call Yeas-92 Nays-3 |
2018-04-11 | House | Read second time |
2018-04-03 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2018-04-03 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: S.Rivers |
2018-03-22 | House | Committee report: Favorable Ways and Means |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2017-02-08 | House | Introduced and read first time |