SC H3681 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Committee report: Favorable Medical Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 44-95-45 So As To Provide That Political Subdivisions Of This State May Not Enact Any Laws, Ordinances, Or Rules Pertaining To Ingredients, Flavors, Or Licensing Of Cigarettes, Electronic Smoking Devices, E-liquid, Vapor Products, Tobacco Products, Or Alternative Nicotine Products; And To Provide That Such Laws, Ordinances, And Rules Enacted By A Political Subdivision Prior To December 31, 2020, Are Not Subject To The Preemption Imposed By This Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Smoking

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-07 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 80 N: 23 NV: 4 Abs: 17) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-22SenateCommittee report: Favorable Medical Affairs
2021-04-22SenatePolled out of committee Medical Affairs
2021-04-08SenateReferred to Committee on Medical Affairs
2021-04-08SenateIntroduced and read first time
2021-04-08HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2021-04-07HouseRoll call Yeas-80 Nays-23
2021-04-07HouseRead second time
2021-04-07HouseAmended
2021-04-06HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
2021-01-14HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-01-14HouseIntroduced and read first time

Same As/Similar To

S0498 (Similar To) 2021-01-28 - Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
449545(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback