SC H3681 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 55-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Oremus
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Oremus
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, To Establish The "equal Opportunity Education Scholarship Account Act" By Adding Chapter 8 To Title 59 So As To Provide A Citation, To State The Purpose Of The Chapter, To Provide Necessary Definitions, To Provide For The Establishment And Funding Of Accounts For Use In Meeting Certain Education Expenses Of Eligible Students, To Provide Guidelines For The Use Of Such Funds And Penalties For Misuse, To Provide Certain Related Powers And Duties Of The Education Oversight Committee, And To Create A Parental Review Panel To Assist In Determining Whether Certain Expenses Constitute Qualified Education Expenses, Among Other Things.
Title
Equal Opportunity Education Scholarship Account Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Oremus |
2020-02-27 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Haddon |
2019-05-01 | House | Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: Magnuson |
2019-04-30 | House | Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: Sottile, Weeks, McCoy, Tallon |
2019-03-28 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Lucas |
2019-03-21 | House | Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: Cogswell |
2019-03-19 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Simrill |
2019-02-07 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Spires, West, D.C.Moss |
2019-01-31 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Martin |
2019-01-29 | House | Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: Bernstein, Brawley |
2019-01-29 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Crawford, Ballentine, Herbkersman, W.Newton |
2019-01-24 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: McCoy, Cogswell, Hixon |
2019-01-23 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Loftis |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0523 (Similar To) 2019-02-14 - Referred to Committee on Education
S0556 (Similar To) 2019-02-26 - Referred to Committee on Education
S0556 (Similar To) 2019-02-26 - Referred to Committee on Education
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3681&session=123&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3681_20190122.htm |