SC H3679 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-25 - Act No. 248
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-25 - Act No. 248
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorize The Aiken County Council And The Aiken City Council To Transfer The Vietnam War Memorial, Eternal Flame, And United States Flag Installations To The Aiken County Veterans Memorial Park. - Ratified Title
Title
Authorize to transfer the Vietnam War Memorial, Eternal Flame, and US Flag Installations to the Aiken County Veterans Memorial Park
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 28 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-25 | Act No. 248 | |
2022-04-07 | Effective date 04/04/22 | |
2022-04-04 | Signed By Governor | |
2022-03-29 | Ratified R 135 | |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Read third time and enrolled |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Introduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2022-03-04 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2022-03-03 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2022-03-03 | House | Roll call Yeas-86 Nays-0 |
2022-03-03 | House | Read second time |
2022-03-02 | House | Delegation report: Favorable Aiken Delegation |
2021-02-23 | House | Recommitted to Aiken Delegation |
2021-02-18 | House | Committee report: Favorable Aiken Delegation |
2021-02-03 | House | Referred to Aiken Delegation |
2021-02-03 | House | Recalled from Committee on Education and Public Works |
2021-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2021-01-14 | House | Introduced and read first time |