SC H3677 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Act No. 126
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Act No. 126
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adopt Revised Code Volumes 6 And 16 Of The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, To The Extent Of Their Contents, As The Only General Permanent Statutory Law Of The State As Of January 1, 2017
Title
Code volumes revised and adopted
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-12 | Act No. 126 | |
2017-03-15 | Effective date 3/10/17 | |
2017-03-10 | Signed By Governor | |
2017-03-07 | Ratified R 7 | |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Read third time and enrolled |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0 |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |
2017-02-09 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2017-02-08 | House | Roll call Yeas-109 Nays-0 |
2017-02-08 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-07 | House | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |