SC H3677 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-12 - Act No. 59
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-12 - Act No. 59
Summary
AN ACT TO AMEND THE CODE OF LAWS OF SOUTH CAROLINA, 1976, BY ENACTING THE "VIOLENCE AGAINST WOMEN FEDERAL COMPLIANCE ACT" SO AS TO CONFORM STATE LAW TO FEDERAL REQUIREMENTS; TO AMEND SECTION 16-3-740, RELATING TO TESTING CERTAIN CRIMINALS FOR HEPATITIS B AND THE HUMAN IMMUNODEFICIENCY VIRUS AT THE REQUEST OF A VICTIM, SO AS TO REVISE THE DEFINITION OF "OFFENDER" TO INCLUDE ADULTS AND JUVENILES, TO REVISE PROCEDURES FOR DISCLOSING TEST RESULTS, TO PROVIDE THAT THE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL SHALL ADVISE THE VICTIM OF AVAILABLE TREATMENT OPTIONS AND, UPON REQUEST OF THE VICTIM, TEST THE VICTIM AND PROVIDE POST-TESTING COUNSELING; BY ADDING SECTION 16-3-750 SO AS TO PROVIDE THAT LAW ENFORCEMENT AND PROSECUTING OFFICERS MAY REQUEST A VICTIM OF AN ALLEGED CRIMINAL SEXUAL CONDUCT OFFENSE TO SUBMIT TO A POLYGRAPH EXAMINATION IF THE CREDIBILITY OF THE VICTIM IS AT ISSUE AND TO PROHIBIT LAW ENFORCEMENT OR SUCH OFFICERS FROM REQUIRING A VICTIM TO SUBMIT TO SUCH EXAMINATION AS A CONDITION OF PROCEEDING WITH THE INVESTIGATION, CHARGING, OR PROSECUTION OF THE OFFENSE; TO AMEND SECTION 16-3-1350, RELATING TO MEDICOLEGAL EXAMINATIONS OF VICTIMS OF CRIMINAL SEXUAL CONDUCT OR CHILD SEX ABUSE, SO AS TO DELETE THE PROVISION REQUIRING SUCH A VICTIM TO FILE AN INCIDENT REPORT WITH A LAW ENFORCEMENT AGENCY IN ORDER TO RECEIVE A MEDICOLEGAL EXAMINATION WITHOUT CHARGE; AND BY ADDING SECTION 16-25-30 SO AS TO PROVIDE THAT A PERSON CONVICTED OF CRIMINAL DOMESTIC VIOLENCE OR CRIMINAL DOMESTIC VIOLENCE OF A HIGH AND AGGRAVATED NATURE MUST BE NOTIFIED IN WRITING THAT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL LAW IT IS UNLAWFUL FOR SUCH AN OFFENDER TO SHIP, TRANSPORT, OR POSSESS A FIREARM. - ratified title
Title
Provide That A Person Convicted Of Criminal Domestic Violence Or Criminal Domestic Violence Of A High And Aggravated Nature Must Be Notified In Writing That Pursuant To Federal Law It Is Unlawful For Such An Offender To Ship, Transport, Or Possess A Firearm. - Ratified Title
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-12 | Act No. 59 | |
2009-06-11 | Effective date 06/02/09 | |
2009-06-02 | Signed By Governor | |
2009-05-27 | Ratified R 111 | |
2009-05-20 | Roll call Yeas-117 Nays-0 HJ-42 | |
2009-05-20 | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled HJ-41 | |
2009-05-14 | Read third time and returned to House with amendments SJ-24 | |
2009-05-13 | Read second time SJ-54 | |
2009-05-13 | Committee Amendment Amended and Adopted SJ-54 | |
2009-05-06 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary SJ-16 | |
2009-05-05 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary SJ-9 | |
2009-05-05 | Introduced and read first time SJ-9 | |
2009-05-01 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2009-05-01 | Read third time and sent to Senate HJ-2 | |
2009-04-30 | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day HJ-36 | |
2009-04-30 | Read second time HJ-36 | |
2009-04-30 | Amended HJ-34 | |
2009-04-29 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary HJ-177 | |
2009-03-25 | Roll call Yeas-70 Nays-41 HJ-42 | |
2009-03-25 | Committed to Committee on Judiciary HJ-40 | |
2009-03-11 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2009-03-09 | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference HJ-7 |
Same As/Similar To
S0512 (Similar To) -
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 25 | 30 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 3 | 1350 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 3 | 740 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 3 | 750 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=3677&session=118 |