SC H3664 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-04 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Huggins
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-04 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Huggins
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revise The Weight Limitation On Cigarettes From Three Pounds Or Less Per One Thousand Cigarettes To Four And One-half Pounds Or Less Per One Thousand Cigarettes And To Exempt Those Wrapped Totally In Tobacco Leaf With No Filter, And To Define "cigarette" To Include 0.325 Ounces Of Tobacco Likely Intended To Be Purchased To Roll Your Own Cigarettes; And To Require The Director Of The Department Of Revenue To Determine If There Are Barriers To The Enforcement Or Collection Of Cigarette Taxes, To Make Recommendations To Remove These Barriers, And To Report Their Findings To The General Assembly.
Title
Cigarette surtax
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Huggins |
2017-02-16 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Erickson |
2017-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2017-02-02 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0575 (Similar To) 2017-03-22 - Referred to Committee on Finance
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3664&session=122&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/3664_20170202.htm |