SC H3663 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-23 - Act No. 100
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-23 - Act No. 100
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Suspend The Requirement That The Department Of Education Provide Printed Copies Of 2011 District And School Report Cards; To Require A School District Or School Within The District To Provide Parents With A Link To The Report Cards Via Email Or Other Communication Methods Upon Certain Conditions; To Require The Department To Suspend Writing Assessments For Certain Grades, And To Provide That Writing Assessments May Not Be Used In Growth Calculations; To Suspend The Requirement That Schools Advertise The District And School 2011 Report Card, But To Require Results To Be Provided To An Area Newspaper Of General Circulation; To Allow High Schools To Offer State-funded Workkey Assessments To Certain Students; To Provide For A One-year Grace Period For Certain Recipients Of A South Carolina Teacher Loan, And To Require The South Carolina Student Loan Corporation To Develop Forms And Procedures To Implement The Grace Period; And To Direct Savings From Certain Provisions Of This Act
Title
Report Cards
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-18 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - House - House: Passage of Bill (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - House - House: Passage of Bill (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-23 | Act No. 100 | |
2011-06-14 | Effective date 06/07/11 | |
2011-06-07 | Signed By Governor | |
2011-06-01 | Ratified R 76 | |
2011-05-19 | Read third time and enrolled | |
2011-05-18 | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0 | |
2011-05-18 | Read second time | |
2011-05-17 | Committee report: Favorable Education | |
2011-04-28 | Referred to Committee on Education | |
2011-04-28 | Introduced and read first time | |
2011-04-27 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2011-04-27 | Read third time and sent to Senate | |
2011-04-26 | Roll call Yeas-105 Nays-0 | |
2011-04-26 | Read second time | |
2011-04-26 | Amended | |
2011-04-13 | Debate adjourned until Tuesday, April 26, 2011 | |
2011-04-12 | Debate adjourned until Wednesday, April 13, 2011 | |
2011-04-12 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: McLeod | |
2011-04-07 | Debate adjourned until Tuesday, April 12, 2011 | |
2011-04-06 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Bales | |
2011-04-05 | Recalled from Committee on Education and Public Works | |
2011-02-10 | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works | |
2011-02-10 | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H4904 (Similar To) 2012-09-05 - Act No. 315