SC H3661 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 5-3-320 So As To Clarify The Meaning Of The Term "contiguous" When A Municipality That Is Located Entirely Within The Borders Of A Special Purpose District Annexes Unincorporated Property That Is Also Located Within The Same Special Purpose District As The Annexing Municipality.
Title
Special purpose districts
Sponsors
Rep. Peter McCoy [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-08 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2019-05-09 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2019-05-08 | House | Roll call Yeas-101 Nays-0 |
2019-05-08 | House | Read second time |
2019-05-08 | House | Requests for debate removed-Rep |
2019-05-08 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2019-05-08 | House | Amended |
2019-05-07 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 5-8-19 |
2019-05-02 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 5-7-19 |
2019-04-25 | House | Debate adjourned until Thur., 5-2-19 |
2019-04-24 | House | Debate adjourned until Thur., 4-25-19 |
2019-04-23 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 4-24-19 |
2019-04-09 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 4-16-19 |
2019-03-27 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2019-01-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0669 (Similar To) 2019-03-14 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary