SC H3659 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 34-16)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Act No. 62
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Chapter 41 To Title 58 Entitled "renewable Energy Programs" So As To Define Relevant Terms, To Provide Review And Approval Proceedings By The Public Service Commission For Electrical Utilities' Avoided Cost Methodologies, Standard Offers, Form Contracts, And Commitment To Sell Forms, And To Establish Voluntary Renewable Energy Programs; By Adding Section 58-27-845 So As To Enumerate Specific Rights Owed To Every Electrical Utility Customer In South Carolina; To Amend Section 58-40-10, Relating To Definitions Applicable To Net Energy Metering, So As To Revise The Definition Of "customer-generator", And To Define "solar Choice Metering Measurement"; To Amend Section 58-40-20, Relating To Net Energy Metering Rates, So As To Declare The Intent Of The General Assembly, To Require Net Energy Metering, And To Establish Additional Requirements For The Public Service Commission; To Amend Section 58-27-2610, Relating To Leases Of Renewable Electric Generation Facilities, So As To, Among Other Things, Remove The Solar Leasing Cap; To Amend Section 58-37-40, Relating To Integrated Resource Plans, So As To, Among Other Things, Establish Mandatory Contents Of Integrated Resource Plans And Provide For Certain Reporting Requirements; By Adding Section 58-37-60 So As To Authorize An Independent Study To Evaluate The Integration Of Renewable Energy And Emerging Energy Technologies Into The Electric Grid; To Amend Section 58-33-110, Relating To Required Preconstruction Certifications For Major Utility Facilities, So As To Provide That A Person May Not Begin Construction Of A Major Utility Facility Without First Having Made A Demonstration That The Facility To Be Built Has Been Compared To Other Generation Options In Terms Of Cost, Reliability, And Other Regulatory Implications Deemed Legally Or Reasonably Necessary For Consideration By The Commission; To Amend Section 58-27-460, Relating To The Promulgation Of Standards For Interconnection Of Renewable Energy, So As To, Among Other Things, Require The Public Service Commission To Periodically Review The Standards For Interconnection And Parallel Operation Of Generating Facilities To An Electrical Utility's Distribution And Transmission System; By Adding Section 58-27-2660 So As To Require The Office Of Regulatory Staff And The Department Of Consumer Affairs To Develop Consumer Protection Regulations Regarding The Sale Or Lease Of Renewable Energy Generation Facilities; To Amend Section 58-4-10, As Amended, Relating To The Office Of Regulatory Staff, So As To Provide That The Office Of Regulatory Staff Must Be Considered A Party Of Record In All Filings, Applications, Or Proceedings Before The Public Service Commission; And To Amend Section 58-4-100, Relating To The Employment Of Expert Witnesses, So As To Exempt The Office Of Regulatory Staff From The State Procurement Code In The Selection And Employment Of Certain Expert Witnesses And Third-party Consultants. - Ratified Title

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SC Energy Freedom Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-09 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-05 Act No. 62
2019-05-31 Effective date 05/16/19
2019-05-16 Signed By Governor
2019-05-13 Ratified R 82
2019-05-09HouseRoll call Yeas-103 Nays-0
2019-05-09HouseConcurred in Senate amendment and enrolled
2019-05-08SenateRoll call Ayes-46 Nays-0
2019-05-08SenateRead third time and returned to House with amendments
2019-05-08SenateAmended
2019-05-08SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2019-05-02SenateRead second time
2019-04-10SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
2019-03-15SenateReferred to Subcommittee: Gambrell (ch), Hutto, Massey, Sabb, Climer
2019-02-26SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-02-26SenateIntroduced and read first time
2019-02-22 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-02-22HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2019-02-21HouseUnanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
2019-02-21HouseRoll call Yeas-110 Nays-0
2019-02-21HouseRead second time
2019-02-21HouseAmended
2019-02-21HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Henderson-Myers, Daning
2019-02-20HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Bradley, Willis, Toole
2019-02-19HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: B.Cox, Elliott, Morgan, Loftis
2019-02-19 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-02-15 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-02-14HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry
2019-02-14HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Anderson, Hardee, Cogswell, Tallon, Sandifer, West, Gagnon, Forrester, B.Newton, Blackwell, Spires, Calhoon
2019-02-13HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Huggins
2019-02-12HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Funderburk
2019-02-07HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Hyde, Jefferson, R.Williams
2019-02-05HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Thigpen
2019-01-31HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Garvin, Cobb-Hunter, Norrell
2019-01-29HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Young
2019-01-29HouseMember(s) request name removed as sponsor: B.Newton
2019-01-22HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Bernstein, Mace
2019-01-17HouseReferred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
2019-01-17HouseIntroduced and read first time

Same As/Similar To

S0332 (Similar To) 2019-02-07 - Referred to Subcommittee: Gambrell (ch), Hutto, Massey, Sabb, Climer

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
58272610(n/a)See Bill Text
58272660(n/a)See Bill Text
5827460(n/a)See Bill Text
5827845(n/a)See Bill Text
5833110(n/a)See Bill Text
583740(n/a)See Bill Text
583760(n/a)See Bill Text
58410(n/a)See Bill Text
584100(n/a)See Bill Text
584010(n/a)See Bill Text
584020(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3659&session=123&summary=B
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3659_20190117.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3659_20190214.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3659_20190215.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3659_20190219.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3659_20190221.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3659_20190222.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3659_20190410.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3659_20190410A.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3659_20190508.htm
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=15706
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16761
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16834

Bill Comments

feedback