SC H3643 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 74-41)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Reconsider vote whereby read second time
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Define Certain Terms Concerning Anti-semitism, To Provide Institutions Of Higher Learning In This State Shall Consider This Definition When Reviewing, Investigating, Or Deciding Whether There Has Been A Violation Of An Institutional Policy Prohibiting Discriminatory Practices On The Basis Of Religion, And To Provide Nothing In This Act May Be Construed To Diminish Or Infringe Upon Any Rights Afforded By The First Amendment To The United States Constitution Or Section 2, Article I Of The Constitution Of This State.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Anti-Semitism

Sponsors

Rep. Alan Clemmons [R]Rep. Beth Bernstein [D]Rep. Todd Rutherford [D]Rep. Dwight Loftis [R]
Rep. Rick Quinn [R]Rep. William Clyburn [D]Rep. Patricia Henegan [D]Rep. Michael Sottile [R]
Rep. Richard Yow [R]Rep. Joseph Neal [D]Rep. Raye Felder [R]Rep. Wendell Gilliard [D]
Rep. Anne Parks [D]Rep. Carl Anderson [D]Rep. Jerry Govan [D]Rep. Ivory Thigpen [D]
Rep. William Wheeler [D]Rep. Garry Smith [R]Rep. James Burns [R]Rep. William Chumley [R]
Rep. Richard Martin [R]Rep. Brandon Newton [R]Rep. David Mack [D]Rep. Russell Fry [R]
Rep. Kevin Hardee [R]Rep. James Lucas [R]Rep. Eric Bedingfield [R]Rep. Peter McCoy [R]
Rep. Weston Newton [R]Rep. Craig Gagnon [R]Rep. Kirkman Finlay [R]Rep. Joshua Putnam [R]
Rep. Terry Alexander [D]Rep. Merita Allison [R]Rep. Nathan Ballentine [R]Rep. Bruce Bannister [R]
Rep. Gary Clary [R]Rep. William Cogswell [R]Rep. Heather Crawford [R]Rep. Gregory Delleney [R]
Rep. MaryGail Douglas [D]Rep. Gregory Duckworth [R]Rep. Shannon Erickson [R]Rep. Michael Forrester [R]
Rep. Laurie Funderburk [D]Rep. Daniel Hamilton [R]Rep. Phyllis Henderson [R]Rep. William Herbkersman [R]
Rep. Davey Hiott [R]Rep. Wallace Jordan [R]Rep. John King [D]Rep. Phillip Lowe [R]
Rep. Harold Mitchell [D]Rep. Christopher Murphy [R]Rep. Mandy Norrell [D]Rep. Michael Pitts [R]
Rep. Thomas Pope [R]Rep. Robert Ridgeway [D]Rep. Samuel Rivers [R]Rep. William Sandifer [R]
Rep. Gary Simrill [R]Rep. Murrell Smith [R]Rep. Leonidas Stavrinakis [D]Rep. Tommy Stringer [R]
Rep. Edward Tallon [R]Rep. Jackson Whipper [D]Rep. William Whitmire [R]Rep. Mark Willis [R]
Rep. Todd Atwater [R]Rep. Chip Huggins [R]Rep. Steven Long [R]Rep. McLain Toole [R]
Rep. Dennis Moss [R]Rep. Katherine Arrington [R]Rep. Linda Bennett [R]Rep. Sylleste Davis [R]
Rep. John West [R]Rep. William Hewitt [R]Rep. Jeffrey Bradley [R]Rep. Steve Moss [R]
Rep. Frank Atkinson [D]Rep. Michael Anthony [D]Rep. David Weeks [D]Rep. Neal Collins [R]
Rep. James Smith [D]Rep. Jackie Hayes [D]Rep. Bart Blackwell [R]Rep. Roger Kirby [D]
Rep. Jeffrey Johnson [R]Rep. William Hixon [R]Rep. Robert Williams [D]Rep. Joseph Jefferson [D]
Rep. Patsy Knight [D]Rep. Brian White [R]Rep. Justin Bamberg [D]Rep. Joseph McEachern [D]
Rep. John Mccravy [R]Rep. Anne Thayer [R]Rep. Jason Elliott [R]Rep. Derham Cole [R]
Rep. Roy Magnuson [R]Rep. Cally Forrest [R]Rep. Gilda Cobb-Hunter [D]Rep. Robert Brown [D]
Rep. William Bowers [D]Rep. Lonnie Hosey [D]Rep. William Crosby [R]Rep. Kit Spires [R]
Rep. Cezar McKnight [D]Rep. Russell Ott [D]Rep. Jimmy Bales [D]Rep. Michael Rivers [D]
Rep. Leon Howard [D]Rep. Joseph Daning [R]Rep. Mike Ryhal [R]

Roll Calls

2017-03-09 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 103 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-11SenateReconsider vote whereby read second time
2017-05-09SenateRead second time
2017-05-02SenateRecalled from Committee on Education
2017-03-14SenateReferred to Committee on Education
2017-03-14SenateIntroduced and read first time
2017-03-10HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2017-03-09HouseUnanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
2017-03-09HouseRoll call Yeas-103 Nays-3
2017-03-09HouseRead second time
2017-03-08HouseRecalled from Committee on Judiciary
2017-03-08HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Daning, Ryhal
2017-03-08HouseMember(s) request name removed as sponsor: Hill
2017-03-07HouseMember(s) request name removed as sponsor: Dillard, Robinson-Simpson
2017-03-02HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Ott, Bales, M.Rivers, Howard
2017-02-23HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Robinson-Simpson, Cobb-Hunter, Brown, Bowers, Hosey, Crosby, Spires, McKnight
2017-02-22HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Blackwell, Dillard, Kirby, Johnson, Hixon, Williams, Jefferson, Knight, Hill, White, Bamberg, McEachern, McCravy, Thayer, Elliott, Cole, Magnuson, Forrest
2017-02-14HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Atkinson, Anthony, Weeks, Collins, J.E.Smith, Hayes
2017-02-08HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Atwater, Huggins, Long, Toole, D.C.Moss, Arrington, Bennett, Davis, West, Hewitt, Bradley, V.S.Moss
2017-02-02HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2017-02-02HouseIntroduced and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
59101220(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback