SC H3624 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on September 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-09 - Act No. 306
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on September 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-09 - Act No. 306
Summary
AN ACT TO PROVIDE THAT EACH MEMBER OF THE DORCHESTER COUNTY TRANSPORTATION COMMITTEE IS ALLOWED AND MUST BE PAID FROM DORCHESTER COUNTY "C" FUND REVENUES SEVENTY-FIVE DOLLARS FOR EACH MEETING AT WHICH THE MEMBER IS IN ATTENDANCE. - ratified title
Title
An Act To Provide That Each Member Of The Dorchester County Transportation Committee Is Allowed And Must Be Paid From Dorchester County "c" Fund Revenues Seventy-five Dollars For Each Meeting At Which The Member Is In Attendance. - Ratified Title
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-09 | Act No. 306 | |
2010-03-12 | Effective date 03/09/10 | |
2010-03-09 | Veto overridden Yeas-3 Nays-0 | |
2010-03-03 | Veto overridden by originating body Yeas-4 Nays-1 HJ-23 | |
2010-03-02 | Debate adjourned on veto consideration HJ-19 | |
2010-02-24 | Vetoed by Governor | |
2010-02-18 | Ratified R 130 | |
2010-02-02 | Read third time and enrolled SJ-13 | |
2010-01-28 | Read second time SJ-8 | |
2010-01-26 | Introduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar SJ-10 | |
2010-01-22 | Read third time and sent to Senate HJ-1 | |
2010-01-21 | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day HJ-26 | |
2010-01-21 | Read second time HJ-26 | |
2010-01-20 | Delegation report: Favorable Dorchester Delegation HJ-2 | |
2009-02-26 | Referred to Dorchester Delegation HJ-107 | |
2009-02-26 | Introduced and read first time HJ-107 |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=3624&session=118 |