SC H3620 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-12)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - Scrivener's error corrected
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Article 22 To Chapter 3, Title 16 So As To Entitle The Article "penalty Enhancements For Certain Crimes", To Provide Additional Penalties For Persons Who Commit Certain Delineated Crimes When The Victim Was Intentionally Selected Based On Certain Factors, And To Provide Victims Of A Violation Of The Article May Bring A Civil Action For Damages Sustained.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Penalty enhancements for hate crimes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-08 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 71 N: 28 NV: 11 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 79 N: 29 NV: 4 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-06 Scrivener's error corrected
2021-05-05SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
2021-04-14SenateReferred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Malloy, Rice, Senn, Kimbrell
2021-04-08 Scrivener's error corrected
2021-04-08SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-04-08SenateIntroduced and read first time
2021-04-08HouseRoll call Yeas-71 Nays-28
2021-04-08HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2021-04-07HouseRoll call Yeas-79 Nays-29
2021-04-07HouseRead second time
2021-04-07HouseAmended
2021-04-07HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Hosey, Clyburn
2021-04-06HouseRequests for debate-Rep
2021-04-06HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Anderson, Jefferson, Garvin
2021-03-24HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Rivers
2021-03-18 Scrivener's error corrected
2021-03-18HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Weeks, Matthews
2021-03-17HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
2021-03-09HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Tedder, J.L.Johnson
2021-03-04HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Rose
2021-02-23HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Carter
2021-02-18HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Henderson-Myers
2021-01-14HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: R.Williams, Murray, Brawley, Govan
2021-01-13HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Alexander, Wetmore, Kirby, Henegan, Pendarvis, Herbkersman, Collins, McDaniel, Ott, Cobb-Hunter
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-01-12HouseIntroduced and read first time

Same As/Similar To

H3420 (Similar To) 2021-01-12 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3620&session=124&summary=B
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/3620_20210112.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/3620_20210317.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/3620_20210318.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/3620_20210407.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/3620_20210408.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/3620_20210505.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/3620_20210506.htm
Supplementhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/fiscalimpactstatements/H3620%202021-01-12%20introduced.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=19114
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=19140

Bill Comments

feedback