SC H3614 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-27 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Thayer
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-27 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Thayer
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Require The Revenue And Fiscal Affairs Office To Perform A Cost-benefit Analysis Of Proposed Regulations, To Provide That The Cost-benefit Analysis Is A Public Document, To Establish When A Cost-benefit Analysis Is Not Required, To Allow For Retrospective Review And Cost-benefit Analysis Of Regulations Adopted Before December 31, 2014, To Provide Certain Factors That Must Be Considered In The Retrospective Cost-benefit Analysis, And To Authorize The Governor To Take Certain Actions With Respect To Regulations.
Title
Regulatory Review and Rescission Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-27 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Thayer |
2018-02-14 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: S.Rivers |
2017-02-14 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: G.R.Smith |
2017-02-02 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2017-01-31 | House | Introduced and read first time |