SC H3613 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-03 - Referred to Committee on Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 59-155-155 So As To Provide The State Department Of Education Shall Approve No More Than Five Reliable And Valid Early Literacy And Numeracy Screening Assessment Instruments For Selection And Use By School Districts For Kindergarten Through Third Grade, And To Provide Requirements For Such Instruments; By Adding Section 59-155-205 So As To Create The South Carolina Reading Panel, And To Provide The Composition, Functions, And Duties Of The Panel; To Amend Section 59-33-510, Relating To Definitions Concerning The Universal Screening Processes Used In Public School Districts For Students Experiencing Academic Or Social-emotional Difficulties, So As To Provide All Related Screening Tools Must Be Capable Of Identifying Students With Dyslexia Or Other Reading Disorders; To Amend Section 59-155-110, Relating To The Read To Succeed Office, So As To Correct A Typographical Error; To Amend Section 59-155-120, Relating To Definitions In The Read To Succeed Act, So As To Revise Definitions; To Amend Section 59-155-130, Relating To Duties Of The Read To Succeed Office, So As To Revise The Requirements Concerning Coursework Necessary For Literacy Add-on Endorsements And To Revise Requirements For Professional Development In Reading And Coaching For Certified Reading/literacy Coaches And Literacy Teachers; To Amend Section 59-155-140, Relating To The State Reading Proficiency Program, So As To Remove The Use Of Book Clubs For Certain Required Supplemental Instruction; To Amend Section 59-155-150, Relating To The Readiness Assessment Provided By The Read To Succeed Act, So As To Revise The Requirements For Screening And Diagnostic Assessments And Interventions; To Amend Section 59-155-160, Relating To Mandatory Student Retention Provisions Of The Read To Succeed Act, So As To Revise Criteria For Retention And Exemptions From Retention, To Eliminate An Appeals Process, And To Revise Criteria For Intensive Instructional Services And Support Provided To Retained Students; And To Amend Section 59-155-180, Relating To Provisions Concerning Teacher Education Programs In The Read To Succeed Act, So As To Remove The Requirement That Reading/literacy Coaches Be Employed In All Elementary Schools, To Revise Requirements Concerning The Roles And Functions Of Reading/literacy Coaches, To Provide Certain Reading And Literacy Support Services To Schools Identified As Having Certain Levels Of Lowest Achievement On English/language Arts Summative Assessments By Third Grade Students, And To Provide The Manner Of Use For Certain Related Resources.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Early literacy and numeracy screening

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-02 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-03SenateReferred to Committee on Education
2021-02-03SenateIntroduced and read first time
2021-02-03HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2021-02-02HouseRoll call Yeas-112 Nays-0
2021-02-02HouseRead second time
2021-02-02HouseAmended
2021-02-02HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Martin
2021-01-28HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Govan, Murray
2021-01-27HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works
2021-01-27HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Calhoon, Felder
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Education and Public Works
2021-01-12HouseIntroduced and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
59155110(n/a)See Bill Text
59155120(n/a)See Bill Text
59155130(n/a)See Bill Text
59155140(n/a)See Bill Text
59155150(n/a)See Bill Text
59155155(n/a)See Bill Text
59155160(n/a)See Bill Text
59155180(n/a)See Bill Text
59155205(n/a)See Bill Text
5933510(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback