SC H3605 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Act No. 74
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Act No. 74
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Repealing Section 11-11-90 Relating To Meetings Of Appropriation Committees. - Ratified Title
Title
Appropriations Committee
Sponsors
Rep. Brian White [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-06 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 103 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 103 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Act No. 74 | |
2021-06-01 | Effective date 05/17/21 | |
2021-05-17 | Signed By Governor | |
2021-05-13 | Ratified R 90 | |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Read third time and enrolled |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-1 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Finance |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2021-03-10 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2021-03-09 | House | Roll call Yeas-103 Nays-16 |
2021-03-09 | House | Read second time |
2021-03-03 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2021-03-02 | House | Committee report: Favorable Ways and Means |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced and read first time |