SC H3602 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-15)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-01-28 - Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs
Pending: Senate Medical Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Address The Low Rate Of Administration Of Covid-19 Vaccinations In South Carolina By Directing The Department Of Health And Environmental Control To Temporarily Authorize Certain Qualified Health Care Workers To Administer Certain Approved Covid-19 Vaccinations Regardless Of Whether The Health Care Workers Are Otherwise Prohibited From Doing So Under Any Professional Scope Of Practice Or Unauthorized Practice Provision Of Law In This State.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COVID-19 vaccines

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-27 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-28SenateReferred to Committee on Medical Affairs
2021-01-28SenateIntroduced and read first time
2021-01-28HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2021-01-28 Scrivener's error corrected
2021-01-27HouseRoll call Yeas-107 Nays-0
2021-01-27HouseRead second time
2021-01-27HouseAmended
2021-01-27HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: McGarry, Anderson, K.O.Johnson, Wheeler, Rivers, Henegan
2021-01-26HouseDebate adjourned until Wednesday, January 27
2021-01-26HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Cogswell, Hewitt, Jefferson, R.Williams, Murray, B.Newton, Hixon, Carter, Jones, King
2021-01-14HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Govan, Howard, G.M.Smith, Brawley, Cobb-Hunter, J.L.Johnson, Rose, Wooten, Calhoon
2021-01-14HouseRecalled from Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
2021-01-13HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Gilliam, Yow, Bradley, Gagnon, Burns, Chumley, Haddon
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
2021-01-12HouseIntroduced and read first time

Same As/Similar To

H3603 (Similar To) 2021-01-13 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Gilliam, Yow, Bradley, Gagnon, Burns, Chumley, Haddon
S0418 (Similar To) 2021-01-12 - Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs
S0419 (Similar To) 2021-01-12 - Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback