SC H3601 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Act No. 71
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Act No. 71
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Delete Statutory Language Authorizing The Department Of Natural Resources To Issue Bear Tags To Allow The Hunting And Taking Of Bear In Any Game Zone Where Bear Occur, With Special Provisions For Game Zones 2, 3, And 4, To Provide That The Department Must Promulgate Regulations To Set The Conditions For Taking Of Bear, Including Methods Of Take, Areas, Times, Limits, Seasons, And Other Conditions To Properly Control The Harvest Of Bear, To Provide Other Provisions, Procedures, And Requirements For The Hunting And Harvesting Of Bear In Game Zones 2, 3, And 4, To Provide A Requirement That Any Bear Taken Must Be Tagged And Reported To The Department By Midnight Of The Day Of The Harvest, To Make It Unlawful To Fail To Report A Bear Harvest In The Manner Provided By Law, To Provide That The Magistrate's Court Retains Jurisdiction For Offenses Made Unlawful By This Section; And To Provide That The Department, By July 1, 2018, Shall Provide To Specified Recipients A Report Of A One-year Study Including, But Not Limited To, The Harvest Summary Of Black Bear In Game Zones 1 Through 4
Title
Bear hunting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-10 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-31 | Act No. 71 | |
2017-05-26 | Effective date 5/19/17 | |
2017-05-19 | Signed By Governor | |
2017-05-15 | Ratified R 106 | |
2017-05-10 | House | Roll call Yeas-105 Nays-0 |
2017-05-10 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-2 |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-0 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2017-05-05 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Fish, Game and Forestry |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2017-03-30 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2017-03-29 | House | Roll call Yeas-107 Nays-0 |
2017-03-29 | House | Read second time |
2017-03-29 | House | Amended |
2017-03-29 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hixon |
2017-03-28 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hewitt |
2017-03-23 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2017-01-31 | House | Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: Kirby |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2017-01-31 | House | Introduced and read first time |