SC H3596 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 58-13)
Status: Passed on October 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - Act No. 173
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 58-13)
Status: Passed on October 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - Act No. 173
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 12-43-220, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Classification Of Property And Assessment Ratios For Purposes Of Ad Valorem Taxation, So As To Limit Rollback Taxes To Three Years When Land Classified As Agricultural Real Property Is Applied To Another Use. - Ratified Title
Title
Ad valorem taxes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-23 - Senate - Senate: To Concur (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2020-09-23 - House - House: Adopt Amendment 1a Amendment Number 1a (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate: To Reconsider Adoption Of Amendment (Y: 37 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 26 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-09-23 - House - House: Adopt Amendment 1a Amendment Number 1a (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate: To Reconsider Adoption Of Amendment (Y: 37 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 26 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-07 | Act No. 173 | |
2020-10-07 | Effective date 01/01/21 | |
2020-09-29 | Signed By Governor | |
2020-09-25 | Ratified R 174 | |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Ordered enrolled for ratification |
2020-09-23 | House | House recedes from amendment |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-0 Nays-39 |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Non-concurrence in House amendment |
2020-09-23 | House | Returned to Senate with amendments |
2020-09-23 | House | Roll call Yeas-100 Nays-0 |
2020-09-23 | House | Senate amendment amended |
2020-09-17 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2020-09-16 | Senate | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2020-09-16 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-1 |
2020-09-16 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-09-16 | Senate | Amended |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Amendment Reconsidered |
2020-03-11 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Amended |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2020-01-28 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Finance |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2019-04-10 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2019-04-09 | House | Roll call Yeas-91 Nays-0 |
2019-04-09 | House | Read second time |
2019-04-09 | House | Amended |
2019-04-09 | House | Requests for debate removed-Rep |
2019-04-09 | House | Requests for debate removed-Rep |
2019-04-09 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2019-04-09 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Brown, Govan, Moore, Henderson-Myers |
2019-04-04 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 4-9-19 |
2019-03-27 | House | Committee report: Favorable Ways and Means |
2019-03-19 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Weeks, Yow, Whitmire, Hosey, Clyburn |
2019-03-11 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Daning, Allison, Collins, McCoy, Atkinson, Hayes, Kirby, Wooten, Ballentine, Caskey, McCravy, Gilliam, Hill, Chellis, Crawford, Taylor, Young |
2019-03-06 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Johnson, V.S.Moss, Stringer, Willis, Bailey, Elliott, B.Cox, Magnuson, Clary, Hixon, Martin, Davis, Mace, Kimmons, Bennett, Bradley, Jordan, Finlay, Gagnon, McDaniel |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced and read first time |