SC H3584 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 42-3)
Status: Passed on June 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-09 - Act No. 170
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 42-3)
Status: Passed on June 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-09 - Act No. 170
Summary
AN ACT TO AMEND THE CODE OF LAWS OF SOUTH CAROLINA, 1976, BY ADDING SECTION 12-21-625 SO AS TO IMPOSE A SURTAX ON EACH CIGARETTE IN AN AMOUNT OF TWO AND ONE-HALF CENTS, TO PROVIDE FOR THE CREDITING OF THE REVENUE FROM THE SURTAX TO THE MEDICAL UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH CAROLINA HOLLINGS CANCER CENTER FOR TOBACCO-RELATED CANCER RESEARCH, THE SMOKING PREVENTION AND CESSATION TRUST FUND, AND THE MEDICAID RESERVE FUND, TO PROVIDE FOR REPORTING, PAYMENT, COLLECTION, AND ENFORCEMENT OF THE SURTAX, AND TO DEFINE "CIGARETTE"; TO AMEND SECTION 12-21-620, RELATING TO THE ORIGINAL CIGARETTE TAX, SO AS TO INCLUDE THE DEFINITION OF "CIGARETTE"; BY ADDING SECTION 11-11-230 SO AS TO CREATE AND ESTABLISH THE SMOKING PREVENTION AND CESSATION TRUST FUND AND THE MEDICAID RESERVE FUND, BOTH SO AS TO RECEIVE DEPOSITS OF THE REVENUES FROM THE CIGARETTE SURTAX AS SPECIFIED; AND BY ADDING SECTION 11-49-55 SO AS TO PROVIDE THAT IF FUNDS FROM THE SMOKING PREVENTION AND CESSATION TRUST FUND ARE AVAILABLE, AND NOT OTHERWISE COMMITTED, THE DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE SHALL RECEIVE ONE MILLION DOLLARS ANNUALLY FOR FIVE YEARS FOR MARKETING AND BRANDING STATE-GROWN CROPS AND TO ASSIST IN RELIEF FROM NATURAL DISASTERS AFFECTING STATE-GROWN CROPS. - ratified title
Title
Provide That If Funds From The Smoking Prevention And Cessation Trust Fund Are Available, And Not Otherwise Committed, The Department Of Agriculture Shall Receive One Million Dollars Annually For Five Years For Marketing And Branding State-grown Crops And To Assist In Relief From Natural Disasters Affecting State-grown Crops. - Ratified Title
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-09 | Act No. 170 | |
2010-05-26 | Effective date See Act for Effective Date | |
2010-05-13 | Veto overridden Yeas-33 Nays-13 SJ-29 | |
2010-05-12 | Veto overridden by originating body Yeas-90 Nays-29 HJ-25 | |
2010-05-11 | Vetoed by Governor | |
2010-05-06 | Ratified R 193 | |
2010-05-05 | Concurred in House amendment and enrolled SJ-32 | |
2010-05-04 | Motion to Reconsider Pending SJ-12 | |
2010-05-04 | Concurred in amendment SJ-12 | |
2010-04-21 | Returned to Senate with amendments HJ-54 | |
2010-04-21 | Senate amendment amended HJ-54 | |
2010-04-21 | Debate adjourned HJ-24 | |
2010-04-14 | Read third time and returned to House with amendments SJ-113 | |
2010-04-14 | Amended SJ-113 | |
2010-03-31 | Read second time SJ-23 | |
2010-03-31 | Amended SJ-23 | |
2010-03-31 | Committee Amendment Amended and Adopted SJ-23 | |
2010-03-25 | Special order, set for March 25, 2010 SJ-277 | |
2009-05-07 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Finance SJ-17 | |
2009-04-14 | Referred to Committee on Finance SJ-20 | |
2009-04-14 | Introduced and read first time SJ-20 | |
2009-04-03 | Read third time and sent to Senate | |
2009-04-02 | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day HJ-81 | |
2009-04-02 | Motion to reconsider tabled HJ-79 | |
2009-04-02 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2009-04-02 | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day | |
2009-04-02 | Roll call Yeas-97 Nays-22 HJ-79 | |
2009-04-02 | Read second time HJ-79 | |
2009-04-02 | Amended HJ-61 | |
2009-04-02 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Bales | |
2009-04-01 | Requests for debate-Rep(s). Cooper, Rice, Edge, Millwood, Crawford, Wylie, Kelly, and Sellers HJ-66 | |
2009-03-31 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Ways and Means HJ-15 | |
2009-03-31 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: J.E.Smith | |
2009-03-05 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Willis | |
2009-02-24 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Gunn, Limehouse | |
2009-02-19 | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means HJ-6 | |
2009-02-19 | Introduced and read first time HJ-6 |
Same As/Similar To
H3470 (Similar To) 2009-02-10 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means HJ-7
H3486 (Similar To) 2009-02-10 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means HJ-11
H3486 (Similar To) 2009-02-10 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means HJ-11
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 11 | 230 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
11 | 49 | 55 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
12 | 21 | 620 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
12 | 21 | 625 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 74 | 75 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=3584&session=118 |