SC H3582 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-17 - Act No. 7
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Rename Four Precincts And Redesignate The Map Number On Which The Names Of These Precincts May Be Found And Maintained By The Revenue And Fiscal Affairs Office

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voting precincts

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 20) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-17 Act No. 7
2017-04-13 Effective date 4/5/17
2017-04-05 Signed By Governor
2017-04-04 Ratified R 14
2017-03-29SenateRead third time and enrolled
2017-03-23SenateRoll call Ayes-39 Nays-0
2017-03-23SenateRead second time
2017-03-21SenateRecalled from Committee on Judiciary
2017-01-31SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2017-01-31SenateIntroduced and read first time
2017-01-27HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2017-01-26HouseUnanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
2017-01-26HouseRoll call Yeas-97 Nays-0
2017-01-26HouseRead second time
2017-01-25HouseIntroduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
77270(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback