SC H3568 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 25-11)
Status: Passed on June 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-15 - Act No. 69
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 25-11)
Status: Passed on June 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-15 - Act No. 69
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Exempt Certain Construction Materials Used By An Entity Organized Under Section 501(c)(3) Of The Internal Revenue Code As A Nonprofit Organization, To Expand The Exemption For Parts And Supplies Used By Persons Engaged In The Business Of Repairing Or Reconditioning Aircraft, And To Exempt Certain Children's Clothing Sold To A Private Charitable Organization Exempt From Federal And State Income Tax And To Provide Exceptions
Title
Sales tax exemptions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-03 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 75 N: 15 NV: 6 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 75 N: 15 NV: 6 Abs: 28) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-15 | Act No. 69 | |
2015-06-12 | Effective date 01/01/16 | |
2015-06-09 | Signed By Governor | |
2015-06-04 | Ratified R 112 | |
2015-06-03 | House | Roll call Yeas-99 Nays-1 |
2015-06-03 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0 |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Amended |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Finance |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2015-04-30 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2015-04-29 | House | Roll call Yeas-75 Nays-15 |
2015-04-29 | House | Read second time |
2015-04-29 | House | Amended |
2015-04-28 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 4-29-15 |
2015-04-23 | House | Committee report: Favorable Ways and Means |
2015-04-23 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Stavrinakis |
2015-04-15 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Dillard |
2015-02-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2015-02-11 | House | Introduced and read first time |