SC H3560 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-27 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Yow
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 8-11-150 So As To Provide Twelve Weeks Of Paid Family Leave For State Employees Due To The Birth Or Adoption Of A Son Or Daughter.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Family leave

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-27HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Yow
2021-01-13HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Caskey, J.L.Johnson, Cobb-Hunter
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2021-01-12HouseIntroduced and read first time
2020-12-16HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2020-12-16HousePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

S0011 (Similar To) 2021-01-12 - Referred to Committee on Finance

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
811150(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback