SC H3560 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-09 - Act No. 221
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-09 - Act No. 221
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Correct Archaic Language
Title
Teacher dismissal hearings
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-26 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - Senate - Senate: To Lay On The Table Motion To Carry Over (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-11 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 11 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - Senate - Senate: To Lay On The Table Motion To Carry Over (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-11 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 11 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-09 | Act No. 221 | |
2016-06-09 | Effective date 06/03/16 | |
2016-06-03 | Signed By Governor | |
2016-06-02 | Ratified R 252 | |
2016-05-26 | House | Roll call Yeas-92 Nays-0 |
2016-05-26 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-1 |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Amended |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Committee report: Majority favorable, minority unfavorable Education |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Education |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2015-04-29 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2015-04-28 | House | Roll call Yeas-96 Nays-3 |
2015-04-28 | House | Read second time |
2015-04-28 | House | Amended |
2015-04-23 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works |
2015-02-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2015-02-11 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 25 | 410 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 25 | 420 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 25 | 460 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 25 | 470 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 25 | 480 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 25 | 490 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |