SC H3549 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Act No. 12
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Section 50-9-40, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Hunting And Fishing Licenses, So As To Authorize The Department Of Natural Resources To Offer A License, Permit, Or Tag Made Of A Durable Material And To Establish A Fee; And To Amend Section 50-9-50, Relating To The Possession Of A Hunting Or Fishing License, Permit, Or Stamp, So As To Allow For A Person Hunting Or Fishing To Display Their License, Permit, Or Stamp Electronically. - Ratified Title

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hunting and fishing licenses

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-07 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-15 Act No. 12
2021-04-15 Effective date 07/01/21
2021-04-08 Ratified R 18
2021-04-07HouseRoll call Yeas-106 Nays-0
2021-04-07HouseConcurred in Senate amendment and enrolled
2021-03-24SenateRead third time and returned to House with amendments
2021-03-24 Scrivener's error corrected
2021-03-23SenateRoll call Ayes-45 Nays-0
2021-03-23SenateRead second time
2021-03-23SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2021-03-17SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Fish, Game and Forestry
2021-02-24SenateReferred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry
2021-02-24SenateIntroduced and read first time
2021-02-24HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2021-02-23HouseRoll call Yeas-116 Nays-0
2021-02-23HouseRead second time
2021-02-17HouseCommittee report: Favorable Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
2021-01-12HouseIntroduced and read first time
2020-12-16HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
2020-12-16HousePrefiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
50940(n/a)See Bill Text
50950(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback