SC H3548 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-12 - Act No. 62
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-12 - Act No. 62
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That An Officer, Agent Or Employee Of The Department Or A Child Welfare Agency Shall Not Disclose, Directly Or Indirectly, Information Learned About A Child, The Child's Parents Or Relatives, Or Other Persons Having Custody Or Control Of The Child, Except In Cases Involving A Child In The Custody Or Control Of Persons Who Have Military Affiliation
Title
Child abuse and neglect
Sponsors
Rep. James Smith [D] | Rep. Richard Yow [R] | Rep. David Weeks [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-02 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-12 | Act No. 62 | |
2015-06-11 | Effective date 06/04/15 | |
2015-06-04 | Signed By Governor | |
2015-06-03 | Ratified R 95 | |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Read third time and enrolled |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0 |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Polled out of committee Judiciary |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Coleman (ch), Shealy, Turner |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2015-04-29 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2015-04-28 | House | Roll call Yeas-105 Nays-0 |
2015-04-28 | House | Read second time |
2015-04-22 | House | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2015-04-22 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Weeks |
2015-03-05 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Yow |
2015-02-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-02-10 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0363 (Similar To) 2015-01-27 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63 | 11 | 80 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 7 | 1990 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 7 | 320 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 7 | 920 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |