SC H3529 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Scrivener's error corrected
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Provide That Any Regulation Regarding The Use, Disposition, Sale, Or Any Imposition Of Any Prohibition, Restriction, Fee Imposition, Or Taxation Of Auxiliary Containers Must Be Done Only By The General Assembly, To Define Auxiliary Container, To Provide For Legislative Findings, And To Provide For Exceptions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Auxiliary containers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-07 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 73 N: 41 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Table Amendment (Y: 80 N: 32 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House: Reconsider The Vote To Continue The Bill (Y: 51 N: 51 NV: 13 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2017-03-07 - House - House: Table The Motion To Reconsider The Vote To Continue (Y: 49 N: 53 NV: 13 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2017-03-07 - House - House: Continue The Bill (Y: 50 N: 49 NV: 13 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House: Table Recommit (Y: 51 N: 50 NV: 13 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18 Scrivener's error corrected
2018-04-17SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry
2018-02-08SenateReferred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
2018-02-08SenateIntroduced and read first time
2018-02-08HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2018-02-07HouseRoll call Yeas-73 Nays-41
2018-02-07HouseRead second time
2018-02-07HouseAmended
2018-02-07HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Henegan
2018-02-01HouseMember(s) request name removed as sponsor: McGinnis
2018-01-31HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Williams, Hixon, McGinnis
2018-01-30HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Henderson
2018-01-25HouseDebate adjourned until Tues., 1-30-18
2018-01-10HouseDebate adjourned until Wed., 1-24-18
2017-03-07HouseContinued
2017-03-07HouseAmended
2017-03-02HouseDebate adjourned until Tues., 3-7-17
2017-03-01HouseDebate adjourned until Thur., 3-1-17
2017-02-28HouseDebate adjourned until Wed., 3-1-17
2017-02-23HouseDebate adjourned until Tues., 2-28-17
2017-02-07HouseRequests for debate-Rep
2017-02-07HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Martin, G.R.Smith
2017-02-02HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry
2017-02-02HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Anderson
2017-02-01HouseMember(s) request name removed as sponsor: Henderson
2017-01-25HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Henderson
2017-01-19HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Putnam
2017-01-18HouseReferred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
2017-01-18HouseIntroduced and read first time

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3529&session=122&summary=B
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/3529_20170118.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/3529_20170202.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/3529_20170307.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/3529_20180207.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/3529_20180417.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/3529_20180418.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=12571
Roll Callhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=12572
Roll Callhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=12573
Roll Callhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=12574
Roll Callhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=13882
Roll Callhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=13883

Bill Comments

feedback