SC H3518 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 20 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Roll call Yeas-98 Nays-3
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on March 20 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Roll call Yeas-98 Nays-3
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Amending Section 56-1-395, Relating To The Driver's License Reinstatement Fee Payment Program, So As To Provide The Drivers' Licenses Issued Under This Program Are Valid For An Additional Six Months, To Revise The Amount Of Reinstatement Fees Owed By Persons To Become Eligible To Obtain These Drivers' Licenses, To Revise The Distribution Of The Administrative Fees Collected, To Provide The Department Of Motor Vehicles May Provide Persons In The Program A Fee Schedule Of The Amounts Owed And The Ability To Make Online Payments, To Revise The Types Of Drivers' License Suspensions That Are Covered By This Section, And To Revise The Frequency That Persons May Participate In The Program And The Conditions For Future Participation; By Amending Section 56-1-396, Relating To The Driver's License Suspension Amnesty Period, So As To Limit The Types Of Qualifying Suspensions; By Amending Section 56-10-240, Relating To The Requirement That Upon Loss Of Insurance, New Insurance Must Be Obtained Or Persons Must Surrender Their Registration And Plates, Written Notice By Insurers, Appeal Of Suspensions, Enforcement, And Penalties, So As To Revise The Period Of Time Vehicle Owners Must Surrender Motor Vehicle License Plates And Registration Certificates For Certain Uninsured Motor Vehicles, To Delete The Provision That Gives The Department Of Motor Vehicles Discretion To Authorize Insurers To Utilize Alternate Methods Of Providing Certain Notices To The Department, To Delete The Provision That Allows Certain Persons To Appeal Certain Suspensions To The Department Of Insurance For Failure To Meet The State's Financial Responsibility Requirements In Error, And To Allow These Persons To Provide Certain Documents To Show The Suspension Was Issued In Error; By Amending Section 56-10-245, Relating To Per Diem Fines For Lapse In Required Coverage, So As To Provide The Fines Contained In The Section May Not Exceed Two Hundred Dollars Per Vehicle For A First Offense; By Amending Article 5 Of Chapter 10, Title 56, Relating To The Establishment Of The Uninsured Motorist Fund, So As To Revise The Provisions Of This Article To Regulate The Operation Of Uninsured Motor Vehicles, To Delete Provisions Relating To The Establishment And Collection Of Uninsured Motor Vehicle Fees, To Make Technical Changes, To Revise The Amount Of The Motor Vehicle Reinstatement Fee And Provide It Shall Be Increased Annually, To Provide Suspended Licenses, Registration Certificates, License Plates, And Decals May Be Returned To The Department Of Motor Vehicles By Electronic Means Or In Person, And To Delete The Provisions That Require The Department Of Motor Vehicles To Collect Statistics Regarding Various Motor Vehicle Registration, Insurance, And Uninsured Motorist Fund Issues.
Title
Motor vehicle financial responsibility
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-20 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 98 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 107 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - House - House: Table Amendment 3 Amendment Number 3 (Y: 76 N: 37 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 107 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - House - House: Table Amendment 3 Amendment Number 3 (Y: 76 N: 37 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | House | Roll call Yeas-98 Nays-3 |
2024-03-20 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-45 Nays-0 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-02-23 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Amended |
2023-05-12 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Amended |
2023-04-03 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Amended |
2023-03-29 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Amended |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2023-03-14 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2023-03-13 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Transportation |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2023-02-08 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Amended |
2023-02-08 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2023-02-07 | House | Roll call Yeas-107 Nays-2 |
2023-02-07 | House | Read second time |
2023-02-07 | House | Amended |
2023-02-07 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Williams |
2023-02-01 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works |
2023-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2023-01-10 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2022-12-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2022-12-15 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
S0549 (Similar To) 2023-05-30 - Act No. 51
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
56 | 1 | 395 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 1 | 396 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 10 | 240 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 10 | 245 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |