SC H3518 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-18 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Calhoon
Pending: House Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, To Enact The "medical Ethics And Diversity Act"; By Adding Chapter 139 To Title 44 So As To Set Forth Findings Of The General Assembly Regarding The Right Of Conscience In The Health Care Industry; To Define Certain Terms; To Authorize Medical Practitioners, Health Care Institutions, And Health Care Payers Not To Participate In Health Care Services That Violate The Practitioner's Or Entity's Conscience And To Protect These Individuals And Entities From Civil, Criminal, Or Administrative Liability And From Discrimination For Exercising Their Personal Right Of Conscience, With Exceptions; To Create A Private Right Of Action For Medical Practitioners, Health Care Institutions, And Health Care Payers For Violation Of The Chapter; And For Other Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical Ethics and Diversity Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-18HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Calhoon
2021-02-10HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Taylor
2021-02-04HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Hiott
2021-02-02HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Thayer
2021-01-14HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: G.R.Smith, Bennett
2021-01-13HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Trantham, Oremus, Magnuson, J.E.Johnson, Bailey, Long, Huggins
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
2021-01-12HouseIntroduced and read first time
2020-12-16HouseReferred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
2020-12-16HousePrefiled

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback