SC H3511 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-26 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: B.Cox
Pending: House Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 44-29-45 So As To Allow Individuals To Opt Out Of Infectious Or Contagious Disease Vaccinations And To Prohibit Discrimination Against Individuals Who Exercise Their Right Not To Be Vaccinated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vaccinations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-26HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: B.Cox
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
2021-01-12HouseIntroduced and read first time
2020-12-16HouseReferred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
2020-12-16HousePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

H3217 (Similar To) 2021-02-10 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hixon, Hiott

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
442945(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback