SC H3508 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 36-14)
Status: Passed on July 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-17 - Act No. 284
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 36-14)
Status: Passed on July 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-17 - Act No. 284
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Require The State Regulation Of Public Utilities Review Committee To Submit A Report To The General Assembly Every Five Years Detailing The Effect Of This Act; And To Clarify That This Act Does Not Expand, Diminish, Or Otherwise Affect Certain Provisions Regarding The South Carolina Lightrail Consortium
Title
Government owned communications service providers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-17 - House - House: Table Amendment Number 1 (Y: 89 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House: Passage of Bill as amended (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House: Passage of Bill as amended (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-17 | Act No. 284 | |
2012-07-17 | Effective date 06/29/12 | |
2012-06-29 | Signed By Governor | |
2012-06-28 | Ratified R 326 | |
2012-06-27 | Roll call Yeas-95 Nays-0 | |
2012-06-27 | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled | |
2012-06-07 | Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-2 | |
2012-06-07 | Read third time and returned to House with amendments | |
2012-06-07 | Amended | |
2012-06-06 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2012-06-05 | Read second time | |
2012-06-05 | Amended | |
2012-05-31 | Debate interrupted | |
2012-05-30 | Debate interrupted | |
2012-05-30 | Amended | |
2012-05-30 | Committee Amendment Amended and Adopted | |
2012-05-29 | Debate interrupted | |
2012-05-01 | Debate interrupted | |
2012-04-26 | Debate interrupted | |
2012-04-18 | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-1 | |
2012-04-18 | Special order, set for April 18, 2012 | |
2012-03-29 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2012-03-28 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary | |
2012-03-21 | Recommitted to Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-03-21 | Committee report: Majority favorable with amend., minority unfavorable Judiciary | |
2011-03-07 | Referred to Subcommittee: Rankin (ch), Hutto, Campbell | |
2011-02-22 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-02-22 | Introduced and read first time | |
2011-02-18 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2011-02-18 | Read third time and sent to Senate | |
2011-02-17 | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day | |
2011-02-17 | Roll call Yeas-109 Nays-0 | |
2011-02-17 | Read second time | |
2011-02-17 | Amended | |
2011-02-17 | Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: Jefferson | |
2011-02-17 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Bowen | |
2011-02-15 | Debate adjourned until Wednesday, February 16, 2011 | |
2011-02-15 | Requests for debate-Rep | |
2011-02-09 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry | |
2011-02-02 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Cooper, Mack | |
2011-02-01 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Alexander | |
2011-01-27 | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry | |
2011-01-27 | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0483 (Similar To) 2011-03-07 - Referred to Subcommittee: Rankin (ch), Hutto, Campbell
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 9 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 9 | 2600 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 9 | 2610 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 9 | 2620 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 9 | 2630 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 9 | 2650 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 9 | 2660 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 9 | 2670 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 9 | 2689 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |