SC H3506 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-14 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: May, Dabney
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Article 11 To Chapter 31, Title 23 So As To Provide It Is Unlawful For A Financial Institution Or Governmental Entity To Discriminate Against Certain Manufacturers And Retailers Of Firearms, Firearm Accessories, Or Ammunition, And To Provide Penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-14HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: May, Dabney
2021-01-13HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Caskey
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-01-12HouseIntroduced and read first time
2020-12-16HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2020-12-16HousePrefiled

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback