SC H3491 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-30 - Scrivener's error corrected
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-30 - Scrivener's error corrected
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Make The Provisions Applicable To A Vacation Time Sharing Association.
Title
Vacation time sharing plans
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-20 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-30 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Rankin (ch), Hembree, Johnson |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2013-03-21 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2013-03-21 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2013-03-20 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Edge, Loftis |
2013-03-20 | House | Roll call Yeas-113 Nays-0 |
2013-03-20 | House | Read second time |
2013-03-20 | House | Amended |
2013-03-19 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2013-03-07 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2013-03-07 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Bales, Weeks |
2013-03-06 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2013-02-27 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Toole |
2013-02-26 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Ballentine, Forrester, Sottile, Lowe |
2013-02-21 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: D.C.Moss, Erickson, Herbkersman |
2013-02-20 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Atwater, H.L.Ott |
2013-02-19 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Clemmons |
2013-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2013-02-05 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
27 | 32 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
27 | 32 | 130 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
27 | 32 | 55 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
27 | 32 | 80 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |