SC H3486 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-02 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Thayer
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An Amendment To Section 9, Article Iii Of The Constitution Of South Carolina, 1895, Relating To Sessions Of The General Assembly, So As To Allow That, In The Event War, Social Unrest, Contagious Disease, Epidemic, Pandemic, Natural Disaster, Or Act Of God Renders It Unsafe To The Health And Well-being Of The Members Of The General Assembly To Meet At The Seat Of Government, At The Determination Of The President Of The Senate And The Speaker Of The House Of Representatives, As Appropriate, The Members Of The General Assembly May Otherwise Meet In Annual Session Using Remote And Virtual Technology.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

General Assembly session; allow for remote and virtual session under certain circumstances

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-02HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Thayer
2021-01-13HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: J.E.Johnson, J.L.Johnson
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-01-12HouseIntroduced and read first time
2020-12-16HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2020-12-16HousePrefiled

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback